blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0834124

Designated contracting states AT 
 CH 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 LI 
 NL 
Examination procedure05.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase09.12.1997National basic fee paid 
09.12.1997Search fee paid 
09.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted12.09.2001
Opposition procedure13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.09.2002 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:08.04.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT CH DE FR GB LI NL
 
Event date:08.04.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19971209
 
Event date:23.12.1998 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:ELONEX PLC
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT CH DE FR GB LI NL
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000303
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7G 06F 11/00 A, 7G 06F 11/30 B, 7G 11C 29/00 B, 7G 06F 11/267 B, 7G 06F 11/273 B
 
Event date:27.12.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20001109
 
Event date:12.09.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT CH DE FR GB LI NL
 
Event date:12.09.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:205614
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20010915
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.09.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:28.09.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:RITSCHER & SEIFERT
 
Event date:18.10.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69615187
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20011018
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:30.11.2001 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:10.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20020610
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:12.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20020612
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:12.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20020612
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:26.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20020626
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:28.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20020628
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:02.07.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20020702
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:17.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030617
 
Event date:17.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030617
 
Event date:30.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030630
 
Event date:30.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030630
 
Event date:01.01.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040101
 
Event date:01.01.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040101
 
Event date:04.02.2004 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20030617
 
Event date:13.02.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:27.02.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040227
 
Event date:01.03.2004 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20040101
 
Event date:02.04.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE