Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0839056

EP0839056 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING IOVERSOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MALLINCKRODT INC.
675 McDonnell Boulevard, P.O.Box 5840 St. Louis
Missouri 63134 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Mallinckrodt Inc.
675 McDonnell Boulevard, P.O.Box 5840
St. Louis, Missouri 63134 / US
Former [1998/19]For all designated states
MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL, INC.
675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840
St. Louis, MO 63134 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DUNN, Thomas, Jeffrey
9505 Byrnesville Road
Cedar Hill, MO 63016 / US
02 / WHITE, David, H.
877 Gardenway Drive
Ballwin, MO 63011 / US
03 / KNELLER, Mills, Thomas
7314 Colgate Avenue
University City, MO 63130 / US
04 / JONES, Michelle, M.
16212 Copperwood Lane
Grover, MO 63040 / US
05 / DORAN, Narciso, Ocampo, III
3766 Vincentian Lane
Bridgeton, MO 63044 / US
[1998/19]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2003/17]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1998/19]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date96922444.306.06.1996
[1998/19]
WO1996US10097
Priority number, dateUS1995048238007.06.1995         Original published format: US 482380
[1998/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9640286
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0839056
Date:06.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1998/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0839056
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K49/00, A61K49/04, C07C233/05, C07C233/65
[1998/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IOVERSOL[1998/19]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING IOVERSOL[1998/19]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE L'IOVERSOL[1998/19]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1997National basic fee paid 
16.12.1997Search fee paid 
16.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/19]
11.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2002Fee for grant paid
09.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4396598  (LIN YOULIN);
 [Y]US5177261  (MCCARTHY WILLIAM Z [US], et al);
 [Y]CA1198739  (MALLINCKRODT INC)