blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0840927


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2008  [2008/06]
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
05.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
23.11.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
01.06.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2001 [2001/29]
18.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2001 [2001/27]
17.03.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.05.2001 [2001/18]
02.03.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.04.2001 [2001/16]
26.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2001 [2001/11]
24.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
18.02.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.07.1999 Renewal fee
29.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
22.02.1999 Examination report or reply
04.12.1998 First examination report
03.12.1998 Examination report or reply
15.05.1998 Request for examination filed published on  01.07.1998 [1998/27]
11.05.1998 Request for decision
15.04.1998 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
27.03.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.05.1998 [1998/20]
23.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
16.02.1998 Renewal fee
22.01.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.1996 PCT data prior to European publication