blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0840927
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4195084BGlobal Dossier 10.12.2008B2
JPH11514482 07.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0840927Global Dossier 10.05.2000B1
EP0840927 13.05.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT192879T 15.05.2000T
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU700004B 17.12.1998B2
AU6344896 26.02.1997A
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2227519 12.12.2006C
CA2227519 13.02.1997A1
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69608281D 15.06.2000D1
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69608281T 30.11.2000T2
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1007910 28.07.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9611205 02.07.1996
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6128255 03.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US96779397 10.11.1997
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6128625 03.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US98551297 05.12.1997
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6147940 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
US96775997 10.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6247022 12.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
US98551297 05.12.1997
US62857500 31.07.2000
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6272078 07.08.2001B2
US2001004338 21.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US96139497 30.10.1997
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6388957 14.05.2002B2
US2001056430 27.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
US96981797 13.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6388958 14.05.2002B1
Priority number Date
US60326300 23.06.2000
US96779397 10.11.1997
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2001056424 27.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US62857500 31.07.2000
US98551297 05.12.1997
US50754495 26.07.1995
US83728601 18.04.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9705616Global Dossier 13.02.1997A1
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2007172825Global Dossier 05.07.2007A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2006073185Global Dossier 16.03.2006A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2006019014Global Dossier 19.01.2006A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2004355627Global Dossier 16.12.2004A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4660565BGlobal Dossier 30.03.2011B2
JP2008192294 21.08.2008A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4197330BGlobal Dossier 17.12.2008B2
JP2005339800 08.12.2005A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3932051BGlobal Dossier 20.06.2007B2
JP2006073184 16.03.2006A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3932050BGlobal Dossier 20.06.2007B2
JP2006073183 16.03.2006A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1160728C 04.08.2004C
CN1192285 02.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100437811C 26.11.2008C
CN1495787 12.05.2004A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100385562C 30.04.2008C
CN1501395 02.06.2004A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100414639C 27.08.2008C
CN1501396 02.06.2004A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1917076B 12.05.2010B
CN1917076 21.02.2007A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1064203 22.05.2009A1
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1064793 19.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1064794 01.08.2008A1
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100471585B 07.07.2005B1
KR19990035885 25.05.1999A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX9800613 31.07.1998A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5751672 12.05.1998A
Priority number Date
US50754495 26.07.1995