Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0840927

EP0840927 - COMPACT DISC CHANGER UTILIZING DISC DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.
Sony Drive Park Ridge
New Jersey 07656 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS INC.
Sony Drive
Park Ridge, New Jersey 07656 / US
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS INC.
1 Sony Drive
Park Ridge, New Jersey 07656-8003 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YANKOWSKI, Carl, J.
127 Farm Street
Dover, MA 02030 / US
[1998/20]
Representative(s)Molyneaux, Martyn William
Langner Parry
1-2 Bolt Court
London
EC4A 3DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/20]Molyneaux, Martyn William
Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6RR / GB
Application number, filing date96922640.602.07.1996
[1998/20]
WO1996US11205
Priority number, dateUS1995050754426.07.1995         Original published format: US 507544
[1998/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9705616
Date:13.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0840927
Date:13.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997
[1998/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0840927
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/00, G11B27/11
[1998/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/20]
TitleGerman:COMPACT DISK PLATTENWECHSLER MIT VERWENDUNG VON DISKDATABASIS[1998/20]
English:COMPACT DISC CHANGER UTILIZING DISC DATABASE[1998/20]
French:CHANGEUR DE DISQUES COMPACTS UTILISANT UNE BASE DE DONNEES SUR DISQUES[1998/20]
Entry into regional phase08.01.1998National basic fee paid 
08.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
08.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2000Fee for grant paid
09.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.03.1998M01   Fee paid on   01.04.1998
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
GR10.05.2000
IT10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
ES20.11.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/07]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
GR10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
ES20.11.2000
Former [2004/04]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
ES20.11.2000
Former [2003/46]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2003/09]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2002/02]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/29]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/16]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT10.05.2000
BE10.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0460869  (POULTER GRAHAM PLC [GB]);
 [A]WO9120082  (ARACHNID INC [US]);
 [A]EP0580361  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]);
 [PA]EP0680040  (SONY CORP [JP])