Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0837665

EP0837665 - FASTENER MEANS FOR DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[1999/24]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
SCA Mölnlycke AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WIDLUNG, Urban
Päronvägen 5
S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / JÖNBRINK, Anna, Karin
Beckmans väg 31
S-443 51 Lerum / SE
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Albihns.Zacco
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [1999/06]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
AB Dahls Patentbyra, Box 606
182 16 Danderyd / SE
Former [1998/18]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date96923138.027.06.1996
[1998/18]
WO1996SE00854
Priority number, dateSE1995000249307.07.1995         Original published format: SE 9502493
[1998/18]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9702798
Date:30.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0837665
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0837665
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/56, // A61F13/15
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
Former [1998/18]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR ABSORBIERENDE EINWEG-ARTIKEL[1998/18]
English:FASTENER MEANS FOR DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLES[1998/18]
French:MOYEN DE FIXATION POUR ARTICLES ABSORBANTS A JETER[1998/18]
Entry into regional phase30.01.1997Translation filed 
15.12.1997National basic fee paid 
15.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/18]
21.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.1999Fee for grant paid
29.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES19.01.2000
IT19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2002/27]ES19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
Former [2002/23]SE19.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]SE170239  ;
 [X]FR69136E