Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0840585

EP0840585 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING FASTENER-DEVICE ELEMENTS AND ELEMENTS MANUFACTURED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[2000/10]
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
SCA Mölnlycke AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WIDLUND, Urban
Päronvägen 5
S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE
[1998/20]
Representative(s)Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Former [2000/52]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, P.O.Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [1999/06]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
AB Dahls Patentbyra, Box 606
182 16 Danderyd / SE
Former [1998/20]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date96923139.827.06.1996
[1998/20]
WO1996SE00855
Priority number, dateSE1995000249407.07.1995         Original published format: SE 9502494
[1998/20]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9702799
Date:30.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0840585
Date:13.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997
[1998/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0840585
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0840585
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/56, // A61F13/15
[1998/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/45]
Former [1998/20]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UM VORSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNGSELEMENTE HERNSTELLEN UND ELEMENTE, DIE ANHAND DES VERFAHRENS HERGESTELLT WERDEN[1998/20]
English:A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING FASTENER-DEVICE ELEMENTS AND ELEMENTS MANUFACTURED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE METHOD[1998/20]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS DE DISPOSITIF D'ATTACHE ET ELEMENTS FABRIQUES CONFORMEMENT AU PROCEDE[1998/20]
Entry into regional phase30.01.1997Translation filed 
15.12.1997National basic fee paid 
15.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/20]
31.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2000Fee for grant paid
15.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.10.2001  11.10.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
McGregor, Judit Ester
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/50]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2001  11.10.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
McGregor, Judit Ester
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2001  11.10.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
McGregor, Judit Ester
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2003/11]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2001  11.10.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
McGregor, Judit Ester
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65924 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2001/48]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2001  11.10.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H.
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
09.11.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.03.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.02.2003Date of oral proceedings
27.03.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.03.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.03.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.06.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.08.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition08.05.2003Appeal received No.  T0605/03
02.07.2003Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2006Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
09.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.03.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES03.01.2001
[2002/27]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0262447  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]);
 [A]SE384317  (CONSORTIUM GENERAL TEXTILE [FR])
OppositionEP0233704
 EP0396050
 US5399219