blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0865478

Designated contracting statesBE 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
IE 
IT 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure14.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/47]
Entry into regional phase30.12.1997National basic fee paid 
30.12.1997Search fee paid 
30.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.09.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE
 
Event date:23.09.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19971230
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000221
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7C 10M 125/26 A, 7C 08K 3/38 B, 7C 10N 20/06 -, 7C 10N 30:06 Z
 
Event date:17.12.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20031030
 
Event date:17.11.2004 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20040511