Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865478

EP0865478 - IMPROVED LUBRICATION WITH BORIC ACID ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arch Development Corporation
1101 East 58th Street
Chicago, IL 60637 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
ARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
1101 East 58th Street
Chicago, IL 60637 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ERDEMIR, Ali
439 Westglen Drive
Naperville, IL 60565 / US
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date96923237.007.06.1996
[1998/39]
WO1996US09586
Priority number, dateUS1995048165707.06.1995         Original published format: US 481657
[1998/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9640847
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0865478
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1998/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10M125/26, C08K3/38, // C10N20/06 , C10N30:06
[2000/14]
Former International [1998/39]C10M125/26
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/39]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE SCHMIERUNG MIT BORSÄURE-ZUSÄTZEN[1998/39]
English:IMPROVED LUBRICATION WITH BORIC ACID ADDITIVES[1998/39]
French:LUBRIFICATION AMELIOREE FAISANT APPEL A DE L'ACIDE BORIQUE COMME ADDITIF[1998/39]
Entry into regional phase30.12.1997National basic fee paid 
30.12.1997Search fee paid 
30.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/39]
30.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/47]
14.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9325642  (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2614985  (COOK DAVID L) [X] 1-7,9 * page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 48 *;
 [X]US3037933  (WRIGHT JOHN H) [X] 1-4,8 * column 2, line 16 - line 28 * * column 6, line 21 - line 44 *;
 [X]EP0450630  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 10-13,16 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4297227  (WITTE ARNOLD C, et al);
 [X]US4735146  (WALLACE WILLIAM G [US]);
 [X]US4339339  (MACIEJEWSKI JEREMI);
 [Y]US4935164  (WESSLING BERNHARD M [DE], et al);
 [Y]US5173204  (CHIDDICK KELVIN S [CA], et al);
 [A]US4715972  (PACHOLKE PAULA J [US]);
 [A]US4411804  (DEVRIES DONALD L [US], et al)