blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0888610

EP0888610 - ADJUSTABLE SOLDER BUMP SPACER FOR SLIDER-SUSPENSION ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
For all designated states
Pattanaik, Surya
2796 Glauser Drive
San Jose, CA 95133 / US
For all designated states
Ruiz, Oscar Jaime
785 Pelleas Lane
San Jose, CA 95127 / US
For all designated states
Shum, Wing C.
3589 Deedham Drive
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRATER, Norman, Kermit
321 Los Pinos Way
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
02 / PATTANAIK, Surya
2796 Glauser Drive
San Jose, CA 95133 / US
03 / RUIZ, Oscar, Jaime
785 Pelleas Lane
San Jose, CA 95127 / US
04 / SHUM, Wing, C.
3589 Deedham Drive
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Jennings, Michael John
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Jennings, Michael John
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date96923342.819.06.1996
[1999/01]
WO1996US10578
Priority number, dateUS1996061867219.03.1996         Original published format: US 618672
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9735303
Date:25.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0888610
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888610
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:G11B5/60, G11B5/48, G11B21/10
[1999/01]
CPC data not yet available
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/01]
TitleGerman:EINSTELLBARER LÖTSTELLENZWISCHENRAUM FÜR EINE GLEITSTÜCK-TRÄGERANORDNUNG[1999/01]
English:ADJUSTABLE SOLDER BUMP SPACER FOR SLIDER-SUSPENSION ATTACHMENT[1999/01]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ECARTEMENT AJUSTABLE A PERLES DE SOUDURE POUR ACCESSOIRE DE SUSPENSION A GLISSIERE[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase25.09.1998National basic fee paid 
25.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.1999Fee for grant paid
06.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0265720  (IBM [US]) [X] 1;
 [A]EP0412739  (IBM [US])[A] 1;
 [A]EP0683491  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-20
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.