Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0835218

EP0835218 - YARN CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COPE, Steven, A.
1110 Corner Ketch Road
Newark, DE 19711-2323 / US
02 / FROST, Dennis, L.
38 Mercer Drive
Newark, DE 19713-1561 / US
03 / OAKLEY, Ricky, Wayne
13107 Queensgate Road
Midlothian, VA 23113-4473 / US
[1998/16]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date96923397.224.06.1996
[1998/16]
WO1996US10775
Priority number, dateUS1995000066929.06.1995         Original published format: US 669
[1998/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9701503
Date:16.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0835218
Date:15.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997
[1998/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0835218
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)International search reportEP16.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65H54/71
[1998/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [1998/16]
TitleGerman:GARNSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG[1998/16]
English:YARN CUTTER[1998/16]
French:APPAREIL DE COUPE DE FIL[1998/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.1997National basic fee paid 
10.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/16]
04.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1999Fee for grant paid
28.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5150640  (SCHNITZER TADEUSZ E [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-13 * figures 4-7,9; claim - *;
 [Y]FR769937  (RYO CATTEAU) [Y] 1-3,5,7-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4531555  (TATEMATSU HIROYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]DE1553712  (HEBERLEIN & CO AG);
 [A]GB695827  (TMM RESEARCH LTD, et al)