Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0834046

EP0834046 - METHOD OF LIQUEFYING AND TREATING A NATURAL GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KLEIN NAGELVOORT, Robert
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL
02 / VINK, Kornelis, Jan
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL
[1998/15]
Application number, filing date96923915.121.06.1996
[1998/15]
WO1996EP02760
Priority number, dateEP1995020170923.06.1995         Original published format: EP 95201709
[1998/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9701069
Date:09.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0834046
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0834046
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:F25J3/08
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERFLÜSSIGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ERDGAS[1998/15]
English:METHOD OF LIQUEFYING AND TREATING A NATURAL GAS[1998/15]
French:PROCEDE DE LIQUEFACTION ET DE TRAITEMENT D'UN GAZ NATUREL[1998/15]
Entry into regional phase10.12.1997National basic fee paid 
10.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/15]
30.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2000Fee for grant paid
29.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0254278  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 9, line 15 - page 13, line 17 * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]GB1572899  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [AD] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 58 - page 2, column 2, line 107 * * figure . *