Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0836535

EP0836535 - MACHINE FOR SORTING OBJECTS SUCH AS POSTAL ENVELOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
La Poste (Exploitant Public)
4 Quai du Point du Jour
92777 Boulogne Cedex / FR
[1998/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DARCHIS, Pierre
15, rue Fructidor
F-44300 Nantes / FR
02 / BAUFRETON, Laurent
1, rue des Magnolias
F-44840 Les Sorinières / FR
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Phélip, Bruno , et al
Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Phélip, Bruno , et al
c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96924038.128.06.1996
[1998/17]
WO1996FR01011
Priority number, dateFR1995000802229.06.1995         Original published format: FR 9508022
[1998/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9701398
Date:16.01.1997
Language:FR
[1997/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0836535
Date:22.04.1998
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997
[1998/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0836535
Date:10.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/06
[1998/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SORTIEREN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN WIE BRIEFUMSCHLÄGEN[1998/17]
English:MACHINE FOR SORTING OBJECTS SUCH AS POSTAL ENVELOPES[1998/17]
French:MACHINE DE TRI D'OBJETS DU GENRE ENVELOPPES DE COURRIER[1998/17]
Entry into regional phase29.01.1998National basic fee paid 
29.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/17]
27.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2000Fee for grant paid
25.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.05.2000
ES10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
GR10.05.2000
IE28.06.2000
LU28.06.2000
MC10.07.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT10.05.2000
ES10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
GR10.05.2000
IE28.06.2000
MC10.07.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2003/46]AT10.05.2000
ES10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
IE28.06.2000
MC10.07.2000
DK10.08.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT10.05.2000
ES10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
IE28.06.2000
MC10.07.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2002/27]AT10.05.2000
ES10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
IE28.06.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/50]AT10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
IE28.06.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/29]AT10.05.2000
FI10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
SE10.08.2000
Former [2001/16]AT10.05.2000
PT10.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT10.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2181523  (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1,6-8,10,28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5143225  (RABINDRAN K GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1,6-8,10,11,14,18 * column 5, line 66 - column 10, line 68; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]FR1563001  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC) [A] 4,8,10,11,13,21,23,28 * page 2, column L, paragraph L - page 4, column R, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4328962  (AKERS ROY) [A] 1,8,10,11,14 * column 3, line 26 - column 8, line 43; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0407795  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 23-25,27 * column A; figure 1 *