Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838123

EP0838123 - DETECTING MOBILE TELEPHONE MISUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.12.2001 [2001/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal
Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION
World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / HOBSON, Phillip, William
13 Woodpecker Close, Bishop's Stortford
Herts CM23 4QA / GB
02 / BARSON, Paul, Colin
12 Moorland Road,Boxmoor
Hemel Hempstead, Herts ST1 1NQ / GB
03 / McASKI, Gill
112 Newland Park
Hull HU5 2DU / GB
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Ryan, John Peter William , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow
Essex CM17 9NA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]Ryan, John Peter William , et al
Nortel Patents, London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Application number, filing date96924059.712.07.1996
[1998/18]
WO1996GB01663
Priority number, dateGB1995001438113.07.1995         Original published format: GB 9514381
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9703533
Date:30.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0838123
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838123
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL,   SE [1998/18]
TitleGerman:MOBILTELEFON-MISSBRAUCH-ERKENNUNG[1999/44]
English:DETECTING MOBILE TELEPHONE MISUSE[1998/18]
French:DETECTION DE L'EMPLOI ABUSIF D'UN TELEPHONE MOBILE[1998/18]
Former [1998/18]MOBILTELEFON MISBRAUCH ERKENNUNG
Entry into regional phase13.02.1998National basic fee paid 
13.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
30.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2000Fee for grant paid
18.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE13.07.2000
[2001/51]
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9411959  (CORAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [DA] 1,7,9 * figure - *;
 [A]WO9406103  (HNC INC [US]) [A] 1,7,9 * page 3, line 1 - line 13 * * page 6, line 13 - page 9, line 37 *;
 [A]EP0416173  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,9 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 19 *