Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0897431

EP0897431 - BONDING FIBROUS BATTS WITH THERMOSETTING FIBER-BINDERS OF CERTAIN EPOXY RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2014Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ramcon-Fiberlok, Inc.
6707 Fletcher Creek Cove
Memphis, TN 38133 / US
[2001/34]
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
BUCK, George S.
6707 Fletcher Creek Cove
Memphis, TN 38133 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Buck, George S.
6707 Fletcher Creek Cove
Memphis, TN 38133 / US
 [2001/34]
Former [1999/08]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Woodcraft, David Charles
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/08]Woodcraft, David Charles
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London, WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date96924398.908.07.1996
[1999/08]
WO1996US11465
Priority number, dateUS1996064740909.05.1996         Original published format: US 647409
[1999/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9742367
Date:13.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0897431
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997
[1999/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0897431
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/60
[1999/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNG VON FASERMATTEN MIT WÄRMEHÄRTENDEN FASERBINDEMITTEL VON BESTIMMTEN EPOXYHARZE[1999/08]
English:BONDING FIBROUS BATTS WITH THERMOSETTING FIBER-BINDERS OF CERTAIN EPOXY RESINS[1999/08]
French:LIAISON DE NATTES DE FIBRES A L'AIDE DE LIANTS DE FIBRES THERMODURCISSABLES, CONTENANT CERTAINES RESINES EPOXY[1999/08]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1998National basic fee paid 
08.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/08]
25.02.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
06.04.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
20.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2000Fee for grant paid
13.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.12.2001  21.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH
Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Morf, Jan Stefan
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/17]
Opponent(s)01  28.12.2001  21.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG
Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Morf, Jan Stefan
Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6
81679 München (Bogenhausen) / DE
Former [2003/28]
Opponent(s)01  28.12.2001  21.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG
Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr.
Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6
81679 München (Bogenhausen) / DE
Former [2002/09]
Opponent(s)01  28.12.2001  21.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG
Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Biering, Christine
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH und Co. KG Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
06.02.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.06.2002Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
03.07.2002Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
16.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.10.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/21]
08.02.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.12.2003Appeal received No.  T0084/04
01.03.2004Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2007Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
29.12.2003Appeal received No.  T0084/04
25.02.2004Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2007Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
08.02.2007Date of oral proceedings
19.02.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
GR06.07.2001
LU08.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
DK12.10.2001
MC01.02.2002
DE01.02.2007
[2008/06]
Former [2006/39]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
GR06.07.2001
LU08.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
DK12.10.2001
MC01.02.2002
Former [2005/01]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
GR06.07.2001
LU08.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
DK12.10.2001
Former [2004/39]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
LU08.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
DK12.10.2001
Former [2003/46]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
DK12.10.2001
Former [2003/09]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
Former [2002/48]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
IE09.07.2001
Former [2002/27]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
SE04.07.2001
Former [2002/15]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
CH04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
LI04.04.2001
SE04.07.2001
Former [2002/14]AT04.04.2001
BE04.04.2001
SE04.07.2001
Former [2002/12]BE04.04.2001
SE04.07.2001
Former [2002/05]SE04.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US5100435  (FIDELIS C. ONWUMERE) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4874661  (J.M. BROWN ET AL.) [A] 1 * column 5, line 43 - column 7, line 18; claim - *;
 [DA]US4363680  (BUCK ET AL.) [DA] 1 * column 9, line 54 - line 65; figure - *