Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0897431 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0897431



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 576
11.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
18.04.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
16.04.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
19.02.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
28.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.12.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.12.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.11.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.11.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.11.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.11.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.11.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
10.11.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
07.11.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.01.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
05.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.12.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
29.12.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
11.08.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
09.07.2004 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
09.07.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
09.03.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
01.03.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
26.02.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
25.02.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
20.02.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.02.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.01.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
30.01.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.01.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.01.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.12.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.12.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.12.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.11.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
28.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 23
28.10.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
28.10.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
28.10.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
28.10.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.10.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Description Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.08.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.08.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
18.07.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.07.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
16.05.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
25.04.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.04.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.04.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.07.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.07.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
03.07.2002 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
04.06.2002 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
27.05.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
06.02.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.02.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.01.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.12.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.12.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.12.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.12.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
29.12.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
28.12.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
28.12.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.07.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.06.2001 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
01.05.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.02.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.11.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
13.11.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.08.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
11.08.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.04.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.04.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 64
22.02.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
03.09.1999 Description Search / examination 3
03.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
20.04.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.04.1999 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 1
21.01.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
21.01.1999 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
14.01.1999 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
13.01.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.12.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.12.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.12.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
30.07.1998 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
30.07.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
23.12.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
13.11.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.11.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 64
13.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 62