Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0842137 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0842137



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 498
29.12.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 3
23.12.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
24.11.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
15.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
09.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
09.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
02.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
30.06.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.06.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.06.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
09.06.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2004 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.06.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.06.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
02.06.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
28.05.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
10.06.2003 Claims Appeal 3
10.06.2003 Claims Appeal 3
10.06.2003 Claims Appeal 3
10.06.2003 Claims Appeal 2
10.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
05.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
16.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
09.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
13.02.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
13.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.09.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 26
28.09.2002 Claims Appeal 2
28.09.2002 Claims Appeal 2
28.09.2002 Claims Appeal 2
28.09.2002 Claims Appeal 2
28.09.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.09.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.09.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
11.09.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
19.08.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.08.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.06.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
31.05.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
31.05.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
31.05.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
19.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
15.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
20.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.03.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.01.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.01.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
24.01.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
24.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
08.01.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.08.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.08.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 21
06.08.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 22
13.06.2001 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Opposition 1
13.06.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.06.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
31.05.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.02.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.02.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.01.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.01.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
08.01.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
04.01.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
24.02.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.12.1999 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.12.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.10.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
13.10.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
08.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 6
08.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 6
08.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 6
08.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Description Search / examination 5
08.07.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
18.05.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
04.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.12.1997 Annex Search / examination 8
12.12.1997 Description Search / examination 4
12.12.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
12.12.1997 Translation of priority document Search / examination 17
04.09.1997 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
04.09.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
10.04.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
06.02.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
06.02.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 20
06.02.1997 Priority document Search / examination 12