EP1008992 - SEMICONDUCTOR STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAMATSU, Hiroshi Mitsubishi Denki KK, 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHIKOSHI, Masanori Mitsubishi Denki KK, 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Physiker Lutz H. Prüfer Dr. Habil. Jürgen Materne Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt, Dipl.-Physiker Lutz H. Prüfer, Dr. Habil. Jürgen Materne, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96925126.3 | 29.07.1996 | [2000/24] | WO1996JP02137 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805037 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008992 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
G11C29/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2000/24] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2000/24] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR STORAGE DEVICE | [2000/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEMOIRE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | Translation filed | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05174599 ; | [A]EP0558231 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931029), vol. 017, no. 596, Database accession no. (P - 1636), & JP05174599 A 19930713 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS63191400 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH02203286 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH0628853 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |