Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0840639

EP0840639 - GOLF PERFORMANCE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CaddieCard AS
P.O.Box 113
4508 Soraunedal / NO
[2000/50]
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
Wergeland, Harald
Hjortehaven 13
1300 Sandvika / NO
Inventor(s)01 / Wergeland, Harald
Hjortehaven 13
1300 Sandvika / NO
[2000/50]
Former [1998/20]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB
Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1998/20]Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Application number, filing date96925177.605.07.1996
[1998/20]
WO1996NO00166
Priority number, dateNO1995000273010.07.1995         Original published format: NO 952730
[1998/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9702873
Date:30.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0840639
Date:13.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997
[1998/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0840639
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search reportSE30.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:A63B71/06
[1998/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/20]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR LEISTUNGSAUFZEICHNUNG BEIM GOLFSPIEL[1998/20]
English:GOLF PERFORMANCE SYSTEMS[1998/20]
French:SYSTEMES D'ENREGISTREMENT DES PERFORMANCES POUR LE GOLF[1998/20]
Entry into regional phase09.02.1998National basic fee paid 
09.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/20]
15.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.1999Fee for grant paid
09.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199904   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
FI05.04.2000
GR05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
NL05.04.2000
LU05.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
FI05.04.2000
GR05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
NL05.04.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2003/09]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
FI05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
NL05.04.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2002/42]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
FI05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2002/02]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
FI05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
Former [2001/29]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
FI05.04.2000
Former [2001/11]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US5214679  (METCALF ROBERT G [US]);
 [Y]US5127044  (BONITO ANTHONY [US], et al);
 [Y]US5245537  (BARBER ANDREW T [US]);
 [Y]US4910677  (REMEDIO JOSEPH W [US], et al);
 [Y]GB2271063  (OLIVIA MAY LEISURE LIMITED [GB])