Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0846368

EP0846368 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING A FLEXIBLE RAMP UP AND RAMP DOWN OF THE SECTIONS OF A RADIO IN A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.10.2001 [2001/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/24]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHER, Matthew
1426 Meadow Lane
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / LEE, Dennis
4375 Silverberry Drive
San Jose, CA 95136 / US
[1998/24]
Representative(s)Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/24]BROOKES & MARTIN
High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London, WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date96925308.712.07.1996
[1998/24]
WO1996US11677
Priority number, dateUS1995051926225.08.1995         Original published format: US 519262
[1998/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9708824
Date:06.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0846368
Date:10.06.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997
[1998/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0846368
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:H03G3/30, H04L12/28
[1998/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/24]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR FLEXIBLES EIN- UND AUSSCHALTEN VON TEILEN EINES FUNKGERÄTES IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN LOKALEN NETZ[1998/24]
English:AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING A FLEXIBLE RAMP UP AND RAMP DOWN OF THE SECTIONS OF A RADIO IN A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK[1998/24]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT UNE ACCELERATION ET UNE DECELERATION FLEXIBLES DES SECTIONS D'UNE UNITE RADIO DANS UN RESEAU LOCAL SANS FIL[1998/24]
Entry into regional phase23.03.1998National basic fee paid 
23.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/24]
03.04.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2000Fee for grant paid
19.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US5287384  (AVERY JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 6, line 44 - line 63 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 3 * * column 21, line 14 - line 49 * * column 22, line 50 - column 23, line 10 * * column 26, line 53 - line 64 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]WO9417606  (DIGITAL OCEAN INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 23 * * page 27, line 27 - page 28, line 17 * * page 33, line 26 - line 34 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5404374  (MULLINS JEFFERY L [US], et al) [A] 1-5,10-13,18-20 * column 1, line 16 - line 18 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 40 - line 60 * * column 6, line 24 - line 55 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]  - CEES LINKS, WIM DIEPSTRATEN, VIC HAYES, "Universal Wireless LANs", BYTE, PETERSBOROUGH, NH, US, (199405), vol. 19, no. 5, page 99,100,102,104,106,108, XP000448950 [A] * page 100, column R, line 3 - page 102, column L, line 2 *