EP0849995 - HEAD MEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | For all designated states MEAT RESEARCH CORPORATION Level 6, 26 College Street Sydney New South Wales 2000 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU | ||
For all designated states MEAT RESEARCH CORPORATION Level 6, 26 College Street Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Raymond, Malcolm 34 Andrew Street Capalaba, QLD 4157 / AU | 02 /
FINNEY, Andrew, Leslie 44 Whiteman Street Crestmead, QLD 4132 / AU | 03 /
ROSS, Michael, George 27 Poinciana Avenue Mooloolaba, QLD 4557 / AU | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96925600.7 | 02.08.1996 | [1998/27] | WO1996AU00488 | Priority number, date | AU1999PN00461 | 04.08.1995 Original published format: AU PN046199 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9705782 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849995 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/02, A22C17/00 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
A22B5/0052 (EP,US);
A22B5/0017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, NL, SE [1998/27] | Title | German: | KOPFFLEISCH-GEWINNUNG | [1998/44] | English: | HEAD MEAT RECOVERY | [1998/27] | French: | RECUPERATION DE VIANDE SUR UNE TETE D'ANIMAL DE BOUCHERIE | [1998/27] |
Former [1998/27] | KOPFFLEISCH GEWINNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 04.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0011563 (PARMENTIERE P BLACHE & CIE SA [FR]) [A] 9-11 * page 4, line 8 - line 11 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 6 *; | [A]WO9119422 (STORK PROTECON BV [NL]) [A] 1,6,8 * page 4, line 20 - line 30 * * page 5, line 13 - line 21 * * page 7, line 26 - line 35 * * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 21 *; | [A]WO9320703 (PASSCHIER BOB [IE]) | International search | [A]GB2014430 (CROASDELL DESMOND FRANCIS); | [A]DD158354 (SCHNEIDER DIETRICH, et al); | [A]US4543689 (COUTURE WILLIAM F [US]); | [A]AU1571388 (PASSCHIER BOB); | [A]AU4591593 (NEW ZEALAND MEAT IND RES INST) |