Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0843918

EP0843918 - SPOT BEAM LOCATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inmarsat Ltd.
99 City Road
London EC1Y 1AX / GB
[1999/38]
Former [1998/22]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL MOBILE SATELLITE ORGANIZATION
99 City Road
London EC1Y 1AX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / FEBVRE, Paul
229 Britannia Road
Ipswich IP4 5HF / GB
02 / PHILLIPS, Kevin
79 Oakleigh Park Drive
Leigh-on-Sea, Essex S59 1RR / GB
[1998/22]
Representative(s)Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date96925885.426.07.1996
[1998/22]
WO1996GB01842
Priority number, dateGB1995001550128.07.1995         Original published format: GB 9515501
[1998/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9705710
Date:13.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0843918
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997
[1998/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0843918
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search reportEP13.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/185, H04B7/204
[1998/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL [1998/22]
TitleGerman:GERAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DES ANTENNENSTRAHLUNGSBUNDELS[1998/22]
English:SPOT BEAM LOCATION METHOD AND APPARATUS[1998/22]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN FAISCEAU ETROIT[1998/22]
Entry into regional phase27.02.1998National basic fee paid 
27.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/22]
20.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2000Fee for grant paid
24.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK27.12.2000
[2003/46]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0663736  (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1-68 * claims 1-37 *;
 [X]EP0662758  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-68 * figures 1-7; claims 1-28 *;
 [A]EP0632605  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,8,15,28-30,37,44,57,58,61,65 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4868886  (ASSAL FRANCOIS T [US], et al) [A] 1,8,13-15,28-30,37,42-44,57,58,61,65 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO8402043  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 61-68 * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 25 *;
 [A]EP0533509  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-65 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 42 *