blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969746 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969746



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 71
03.05.2001 Closing of application Search / examination 2
25.01.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
30.10.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.10.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.10.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.06.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.06.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.11.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
16.06.1999 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 1
21.05.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.05.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.05.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
21.04.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 2
21.04.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 2
08.04.1999 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.04.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.02.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.02.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
11.02.1997 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
11.02.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
12.11.1996 Notification of withdrawal of priority claim Search / examination 2