blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969746


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  11.07.2001 [2001/28]
23.01.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
26.10.2000 Examination report or reply
28.09.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
23.06.2000 First examination report
20.06.2000 Examination report or reply
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
26.11.1999 Supplementary search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
26.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
23.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.1999 Renewal fee
16.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
14.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
24.04.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
25.02.1997 PCT data prior to European publication