Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969746

EP0969746 - PROCESS FOR MAKING DEFINED SURFACE MEAT PRODUCT AND PRODUCT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2001
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2001 [2001/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SARA LEE CORPORATION
470 Hanes Mill Road Winston-Salem
North Carolina 27105 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Sara Lee Corporation
470 Hanes Mill Road
Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KRAMER, Lee
1948 Elm View
West Point, MS 39773 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Roger, S.
1777 Bethel N.R. Road
New Richmond, OH 45242 / US
03 / MELLO, Frank, C.
46 West Cottonwood Lane
Columbus, MS 39701 / US
04 / WILLIAMS, Jeffrey, A.
495 Camelot Circle N.W.
Calhoun, GA 30701 / US
05 / MILLER, Dale, V.
11263 Ruralview Drive
Holland, MI 49424 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Dealtry, Brian , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Dealtry, Brian , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date96926221.101.08.1996
[2000/02]
WO1996US12608
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9805222
Date:12.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969746
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/31, A23B4/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLEISCHPRODUKTES MIT DEFINIERTER OBERFLÄCHE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES PRODUKT[2000/02]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING DEFINED SURFACE MEAT PRODUCT AND PRODUCT THEREOF[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER DES PRODUITS CARNES A SURFACE DEFINIE ET PRODUITS AINSI OBTENUS[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase20.05.1999National basic fee paid 
20.05.1999Search fee paid 
20.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
22.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/28]
25.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.04.1999AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999MC   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
21.04.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.04.1999M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.03.199903   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.1999
31.08.200005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4030636  (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 5-9 * column 1, lines 18-65 * * column 4, lines 12-19 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 50 * [A] 1-4;
 [DA]US4879124  (OBERLE TIMOTHY T [US]) [DA] 1-9 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 26 *;
 [A]JPH02245161  ;
 [A]EP0240626  (NIHON TOKKYO KANRI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3413295  (LIESAUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]FR656721  (HELLER H.) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 45, Database accession no. 90-339221, XP002116380 & JPH02245161 A 19900928 (TAKEDA S) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5147671  (WINKLER BRUNO [DE]);
 [A]US3178910  (HERMANN HAMMERLE);
 [A]US4883677  (AIGA TADAO [JP], et al)