blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0846197

EP0846197 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-STRENGTH, HIGH-SHRINKAGE POLYAMIDE 66 FILAMENT YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2014  [2014/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhodia Industrial Yarns AG
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
[2001/05]
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
Rhodia Filtec AG
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Former [1998/24]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC VISCOSUISSE SA
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHER, Klaus
Rosenberghalde 2
CH-6004 Luzern / CH
02 / LINZ, Hans
Guetrütiweg 2
CH-6010 Kriens / CH
03 / BERGER, Luzius
Chemin des Landes
F-81380 Lescure d'Albigeois / FR
[1998/25]
Former [1998/24]01 / FISCHER, Klaus
Rosenberghalde 2
CH-6004 Luzern / CH
02 / LINZ, Hans
Guetrütiweg 2
CH-6010 Kriens / CH
03 / BERGER, Luzius
Rosenstrasse 19
CH-6010 Kriens / CH
Representative(s)Herrmann, Peter Johannes
Rhodia Filtec AG Patentabteilung MP
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]Herrmann, Peter Johannes, Dr.
Rhodia Filtec AG Patentabteilung MP
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Former [1998/24]Herrmann, Peter Johannes
c/o Rhône-Poulenc Viscosuisse SA Patentabteilung IB
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Application number, filing date96926310.220.08.1996
[1998/24]
WO1996CH00288
Priority number, dateCH1995000241524.08.1995         Original published format: CH 241595
[1998/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9708371
Date:06.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0846197
Date:10.06.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0846197
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:D02J1/22
[1998/24]
CPC:
D02J1/228 (EP,US); D02J1/22 (KR); Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHFESTEN, HOCHSCHRUMPFENDEN POLYAMID-66-FILAMENTGARNS[1998/24]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-STRENGTH, HIGH-SHRINKAGE POLYAMIDE 66 FILAMENT YARN[1998/24]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FIL CONTINU EN POLYAMIDE 66 A HAUTE RESISTANCE ET A RETRAIT ELEVE[1998/24]
Entry into regional phase02.03.1998National basic fee paid 
02.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/24]
03.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.1999Fee for grant paid
25.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2807863  (SCHENKER HENRY H) [A] 1* claim - *;
 [A]DE1907782  (RIETER AG MASCHF) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [D]DE3437943  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]);
 [A]GB2148788  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]DE3400832  (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0423807  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0532464  (FILTECO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * claim - * * column 1, line 8 - line 18; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.