blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0789920

EP0789920 - CURRENT MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:SE 
PHILIPS NORDEN AB
Kottbygatan 7, Kista
164 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:SE 
PHILIPS NORDEN AB
Kottbygatan 7, Kista
164 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:SE 
PHILIPS NORDEN AB
Kottbygatan 7, Kista
164 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [1997/34]For all designated states
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:SE 
PHILIPS NORDEN AB
Kottbygatan 7, Kista
164 85 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HUGHES, John, Barry
38 Langdale Gardens,Hove
Sussex BN3 4HH / GB
02 / MOULDING, Kenneth, William
51 Benhams Drive,Horley
Surrey RH6 8QT / GB
[1997/34]
Representative(s)Sharrock, Daniel John, et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
Cross Oak Lane
Redhill
Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/38]Sharrock, Daniel John, et al
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [1997/34]Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date96926532.126.08.1996
[1997/34]
WO1996IB00845
Priority number, dateGB1995001779131.08.1995         Original published format: GB 9517791
[1997/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9708710
Date:06.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0789920
Date:20.08.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0789920
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.04.1997
ClassificationIPC:G11C27/02
[1997/34]
CPC:
G11C27/028 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/34]
TitleGerman:STROMSPEICHERZELLE[1997/34]
English:CURRENT MEMORY[1997/34]
French:MEMOIRE A COURANTS[1997/34]
Entry into regional phase02.06.1997National basic fee paid 
02.06.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
28.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2002Fee for grant paid
02.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
[2008/06]
Former [2002/37]SE27.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0608936  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al)
 [A]  - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, Volume 29, No. 9, Sept 1994, WALTER GUGGENBUEHL et al., "Switched-Current Memory Circuits for High-Precision Applications".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.