Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0845112

EP0845112 - REFLECTING MICROSCOPE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tomey Co., Ltd.
Nagoya-shi Nishi-ku, Noriiakeshinmachi, 2-chome Ban 33 Go
Nagoya / JP
[1999/13]
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
COMPUTED ANATOMY INCORPORATED
28 West 36th Street
New York, NY 10018 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAMMONE, Richard, J.
182 Beaumont Way
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/19]Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1998/23]Dubois-Chabert, Guy , et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96926861.405.08.1996
[1998/23]
WO1996US12637
Priority number, dateUS19950002010P07.08.1995         Original published format: US 2010 P
US19950002684P14.08.1995         Original published format: US 2684 P
US19960683717P18.07.1996         Original published format: US 683717 P
[1998/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9706461
Date:20.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0845112
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997
[1998/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0845112
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.02.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/00, G02B21/06, G02B21/36, G02B27/46, G02B17/00, G02B5/08, G02B5/10
[1998/23]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/23]
TitleGerman:REFLEKTIERENDE MIKROSKOPVORRICHTUNG[1998/23]
English:REFLECTING MICROSCOPE DEVICE[1998/23]
French:MICROSCOPE REFLECHISSANT[1998/23]
Entry into regional phase24.01.1998National basic fee paid 
24.01.1998Search fee paid 
24.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/23]
03.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2002Fee for grant paid
29.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH23.10.2002
FR23.10.2002
IT23.10.2002
LI23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
DE24.01.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]CH23.10.2002
FR23.10.2002
LI23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
DE24.01.2003
Former [2004/02]CH23.10.2002
LI23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
DE24.01.2003
Former [2003/39]CH23.10.2002
LI23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
Former [2003/30]NL23.10.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5144496  (KASHIMA SHINGO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 11 * * column 5, line 36 - line 52 * * figure 3 *;
 [AD]US2628533  (OETJEN ROBERT A) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 7 * * column 2, line 24 - line 38 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4974094  (MORITO YUHKOH [JP]) [A] 1;
 [A]US4832447  (JAVIDI BAHRAM [US]) [A] 1
International search[A]US2212211  (PFUND AUGUST H);
 [A]US5144495  (MERTON HENRY A [US], et al);
 [A]SU1675827  (OBEDINENNYJ I YADERNYKH I [SU])