Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0840752

EP0840752 - PHOTOCHEMICALLY CROSS-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE DERIVATIVES HAVING NO PHOTOPOLYMERISABLE FUNCTIONAL GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  LI  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]For:BE  CH  LI  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FRANCOTTE, Eric
Orisstrasse 4
CH-4412 Nuglar / CH
02 / ZHANG, Tong
6, rue de Boston
F-67000 Strasbourg / FR
[1998/20]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1998/27]
Former [1998/20]Roth, Bernhard M. , et al
Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date96927034.717.07.1996
[1998/20]
WO1996EP03145
Priority number, dateCH1995000216021.07.1995         Original published format: CH 216095
[1998/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9704011
Date:06.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0840752
Date:13.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997
[1998/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0840752
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/00, C08B15/00, C08B33/00, B01J20/00, C09D105/00
[1998/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/20]
TitleGerman:FOTOCHEMISCH VERNETZTE POLYSACCHARIDDERIVATE OHNE PHOTOPOLYMERISIERBAREN FUNKTIONELLEN GRUPPEN[1998/20]
English:PHOTOCHEMICALLY CROSS-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE DERIVATIVES HAVING NO PHOTOPOLYMERISABLE FUNCTIONAL GROUPS[1998/20]
French:DERIVES DE POLYSACCHARIDE RETICULES PHOTOCHIMIQUEMENT NE CONTENANT PAS DE GROUPES FONCTIONNELS PHOTOPOLYMERISABLES[1998/20]
Entry into regional phase29.12.1997National basic fee paid 
29.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/20]
16.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2001/29]FI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]PT19.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0321882  (HERCULES INC [US]) [A] 1,6,18 * column A *;
 [A]WO9213894  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,6,18 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0673102
 [DA]  - L. OLIVEROS ET AL., "Chiral chromatographic discrimination ability of a cellulose 3,5-dimethylphenylcarbamate/10-undecenoate mixed derivative fixed on several chromatographic matrices", JOURNAL OF LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1995), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 1521 - 1532, XP000574145 [DA] 1,6,14,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940620), vol. 18, no. 322, Database accession no. (C - 1214)<6662> , [A] * abstract *