blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0854856 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0854856



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 131
27.02.1997 Priority document Search / examination 6
27.02.1997 Priority document Search / examination 16
27.02.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 32
27.02.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
28.04.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.09.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
21.02.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.02.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
09.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.08.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
31.08.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
17.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
17.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.12.1999 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1