blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0854856
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3827328BGlobal Dossier 27.09.2006B2
JPH11510512 14.09.1999A
Priority number Date
EP9603415 02.08.1996
DE19529874 14.08.1995
DE19619359 14.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0854856Global Dossier 05.04.2000B1
EP0854856 29.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP9603415 02.08.1996
DE19529874 14.08.1995
DE19619359 14.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19529874 20.02.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19529874 14.08.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19619359 20.11.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19619359 14.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59604907D 11.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP9603415 02.08.1996
DE19529874 14.08.1995
DE19619359 14.05.1996
DE59604907 02.08.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6054617 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
EP9603415 02.08.1996
DE19529874 14.08.1995
DE19619359 14.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9707087Global Dossier 27.02.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19529874 14.08.1995
DE19619359 14.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2229481 27.02.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19529874 14.08.1995
DE19619359 14.05.1996