Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0854856

EP0854856 - NITRO COMPOUND-REDUCING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1998/31]
Inventor(s)01 / BAHRMANN, Helmut
Rohstrasse 48
D-46499 Hamminkeln / DE
02 / CORNILS, Boy
Kirschgartenstrasse 6
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
03 / DIERDORF, Andreas
Rauenthaler Weg 30
D-60529 Frankfurt am Main / DE
04 / HABER, Steffen
Hans-Graf-von-Sponeck-Strasse 1
D-76726 Germersheim / DE
[1998/31]
Application number, filing date96927664.102.08.1996
[1998/31]
WO1996EP03415
Priority number, dateDE199512987414.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19529874
DE199611935914.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19619359
[1998/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9707087
Date:27.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0854856
Date:29.07.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997
[1998/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0854856
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C209/36, C07C213/02
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1998/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON NITROVERBINDUNGEN[1998/31]
English:NITRO COMPOUND-REDUCING PROCESS[1998/31]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE DES COMPOSES NITRO[1998/31]
Entry into regional phase16.03.1998National basic fee paid 
16.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/31]
09.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.1999Fee for grant paid
10.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0372313  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * column W *
 [DA]  - J. F. KNIFTON, "Homogenous Catalyzed Reduction of Nitro Compounds. IV. Selective and Sequential Hydrogenation of Nitroaromatics", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (19760402), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 1200 - 1205, XP002018366 [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00869a025
 [PDA]  - AHMED M. TAFESH ET AL., "First Selective Reduction of Aromatic Nitro Compounds Using Water Soluble Catalysts", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (19951218), vol. 36, no. 51, pages 9305 - 9308, XP002018367 [PDA] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)02003-8