Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0845191

EP0845191 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPRESSING DIGITAL IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Barkfort Limited
3 St. James Terrace Malahide
County Dublin / IE
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
Barkfort Limited
3 St. James Terrace
Malahide, County Dublin / IE
Inventor(s)01 / KENNEDY, Jonathan, Marshall, Thomas
38 The Rise
Malahide, County Dublin / IE
02 / KENNEDY, Simon Frederick
38 The Rise
Malahide, County Dublin / IE
03 / KENNEDY, Nicholas Paul
4 The Dunes
Portmarnock, County Dublin / IE
04 / MARSHALL, David
9 Seabury Orchard
Malahide, County Dublin / IE
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Gorman, Francis Fergus , et al
F. F. Gorman & Co.
15 Clanwilliam Square
Dublin 2 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]Gorman, Francis Fergus , et al
F. F. Gorman & Co. 54, Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date96927851.413.08.1996
[1998/23]
WO1996IE00052
Priority number, dateIE1995000061314.08.1995         Original published format: IE 950613
[1998/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9707635
Date:27.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0845191
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997
[1998/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0845191
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search reportEP01.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/34
[1998/23]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMPRESSION VON DIGITALEN BILDDATEN[1998/23]
English:A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPRESSING DIGITAL IMAGE DATA[1998/23]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMPRESSION DE DONNEES RELATIVES A DES IMAGES NUMERIQUES[1998/23]
Entry into regional phase18.02.1998National basic fee paid 
18.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/23]
13.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2000Fee for grant paid
24.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199803   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1998
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
IT15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
DK15.02.2001
SE15.02.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2003/46]BE15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
DK15.02.2001
SE15.02.2001
Former [2003/09]BE15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2002/27]BE15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2002/02]BE15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2001/51]SE15.02.2001
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4809350  (SHIMONI YAIR [IL], et al) [DA] 1-9,31-41,63,64,68 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 40 *;
 [DA]EP0479563  (NASA [US]) [DA] 1-9,31-41,63,64,68 * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 44; figure 1 *;
 [DA]EP0536801  (SPACELABS INC [US]) [DA] 1-9,31-41,63,64,68 * claim 1 *;
 [XYA]FR2524740  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 42-49,65 * page 4, line 18 - line 27 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line L * * page 5, line 20 - line L * [Y] 10-16,20,21 [A] 1,17-19,50-53;
 [X]US4941194  (SHIMURA KAZUO [JP]) [X] 42-47,65 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line L *;
 [A]FR2700230  (ISRAEL DEFENCE [IL]) [A] 25-30,57-62,67 * page 24, line 2 - line 18; figures 9C,9D *;
 [A]EP0434208  (PICKER INT INC [US]) [A] 25-30,57-62,67 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0096220  (IBM [US]) [A] 25-30,57-62,67 * page 6 - page 10, line 13; figure 4 *
 [XY]  - JUHA SALO ET AL, "A NEW TWO DIMENSIONAL PREDICTOR DESIGN FOR DPCM CODING OF VIDEO SIGNALS", SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV, L'AQUILA, FEB. 29 - MAR. 2, 1988, CHIARIGLIONE L, (19880229), no. WORKSHOP 2, pages 207 - 212, XP000075055 [X] 1-7,9,31-41,63,64,68 * page 208, line 3 - page 211 * [Y] 8,10-16,20-23
 [X]  - CARONNA G, "ADAPTIVE DPCM WITH CONDITIONAL CODING (*)", SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV, 2, TURIN, AUG. 30 - SEPT. 1, 1989, CHIARIGLIONE L, (19890830), no. WORKSHOP 3, pages 511 - 518, XP000215267 [X] 1,2,9,31-41,63,64,68 * page 512, line 12 - page 514, line 9; figure 1 *
 [YA]  - ALI HABIBI ET AL, "POTENTIAL DIGITIZATION/COMPRESSION TECHNIQUES FOR SHUTTLE VIDEO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (197811), vol. 26, no. 11, pages 1671 - 1682, XP002020039 [Y] 8 * page 1675, column R, paragraph 4.1.1 * [A] 1-7,9,31-41,63,64,68
 [X]  - F. A. PERKINS, "Performance of a digital TV system, Part I: Source Encoding", INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS. NTC RECORD '72. NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, DECEMBER 4-6,1972, HOUSTON TEXAS., pages 20C-1 - 20C-4, XP002026889 [X] 42-49,65 * pages 20C-1, column L, paragraph L *
 [XAY]  - FLEMING LURE Y S ET AL, "REVERSIBLE COMPRESSION OF MEDICAL IMAGES USING DECOMPOSITION AND DECORRELATION METHODS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ASILOMAR CONFERENCE, PACIFIC GROVE, NOV. 1 - 3, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19931101), vol. 2 OF 2, pages 852 - 855, XP000438417 [X] 54,55,66 * page 853, paragraph 3. * * page 854, column L, line 21 - line 26 * [A] 1,24,56 [Y] 22,23
 [X]  - SATO Y ET AL, "Data compression of gray-scale images by level plane coding", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART 1 (COMMUNICATIONS), JAN. 1988, USA, ISSN 8756-6621, vol. 71, no. 1, pages 87 - 94, XP002026890 [X] 54,55,66 * page 87, paragraph SUMMARY *