blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0957843


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.07.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.09.2001 [2001/37]
05.04.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
28.09.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
07.04.2000 Supplementary search report published on  24.05.2000 [2000/21]
08.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.11.1999 [1999/47]
08.10.1999 Request for examination filed published on  24.11.1999 [1999/47]
20.08.1999 Renewal fee
19.08.1998 Renewal fee
24.07.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
30.06.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
10.05.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication