blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0957843

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure10.04.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/37]
Entry into regional phase16.03.1998National basic fee paid 
16.03.1998Search fee paid 
16.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200005   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.11.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.11.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980316
 
Event date:24.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.05.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000410
 
Event date:12.09.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20010301