Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957843

EP0957843 - COLOSTOMY BAG CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2001 [2001/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bugajski, Mark J.
6052 Alden Highway
Bellaire, MI 49615 / US
[1999/47]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date96928149.214.08.1996
[1999/47]
WO1996US13124
Priority number, dateUS1995051493414.08.1995         Original published format: US 514934
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9706757
Date:27.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957843
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997
[1999/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.02.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/44, A61M31/00, B67D3/00, F16K3/00, F16K31/44
[1999/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/47]
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KOLOSTOMIESACK[1999/47]
English:COLOSTOMY BAG CLEANING DEVICE[1999/47]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR POCHE POUR COLOSTOMIE[1999/47]
Entry into regional phase16.03.1998National basic fee paid 
16.03.1998Search fee paid 
16.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.03.1998Examination requested  [1999/47]
01.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/37]
10.04.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4194506  (VOORHIES PAUL A [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 39 * * figure -; claim - * [Y] 2-5,7;
 [Y]US2364929  (TROTT ARTHUR J) [Y] 2-5,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1500075  (HUDSON MFG CO H D) [A] 2-5,7 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE2339331  (BEYER PAUL) [A] 2-5,7 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4586927  (JENSEN OLE R [US]);
 [Y]US2694546  (GOODE JABUS C);
 [Y]US5096503  (WELLMAN SIDNEY E [US]);
 [A]US3910274  (NOLAN JOHN L);
 [A]US4134404  (WILLIAMS JR CLARENCE B);
 [A]US4654037  (FENTON LEONARD [US]);
 [A]US4941878  (PETRIK ALBERT V [US])