Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0847506

EP0847506 - DISK BRAKE AND POSITIONING AND TRANSPORT DEVICE FOR A DISK BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
[1999/04]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
ITT Automotive Europe GmbH
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHIEL, Wolfgang
Siegener Strasse 59
D-65936 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1998/25]
Application number, filing date96928385.227.07.1996
[1998/25]
WO1996EP03319
Priority number, dateDE199513208031.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19532080
[1998/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9708474
Date:06.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0847506
Date:17.06.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997
[1998/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0847506
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/02
[1998/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/25]
TitleGerman:SCHEIBENBREMSE UND POSITIONIERUNGS- UND TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SCHEIBENBREMSE[1998/25]
English:DISK BRAKE AND POSITIONING AND TRANSPORT DEVICE FOR A DISK BRAKE[1998/25]
French:FREIN A DISQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT ET DE POSITIONNEMENT POUR UN FREIN A DISQUE[1998/25]
Entry into regional phase31.03.1998National basic fee paid 
31.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/25]
17.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.09.2002
GB11.09.2002
IT11.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR11.09.2002
GB11.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/21]GB11.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]ES28.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US4753326  (WEILER ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5;
 [X]US4331221  (EVANS ANTHONY C, et al) [X] 1-3,5