Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957798

EP0957798 - SPINAL IMPLANT CONNECTION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc.
1800 Pyramid Place
Memphis, TN 38132 / US
[2005/39]
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
Simonson, Peter Melott
Suite 414, 770 Claughton Island Drive
Miami, FL 33131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
 [2005/39]
Former [1999/47]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date96928858.814.08.1996
[1999/47]
WO1996US13167
Priority number, dateUS1995051528914.08.1995         Original published format: US 515289
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9706742
Date:27.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957798
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997
[1999/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957798
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.02.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/56, A61B17/70
[2000/17]
Former International [1999/47]A61B17/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/47]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSEINHEIT FÜR WIRBELSÄULENIMPLANTATE[1999/47]
English:SPINAL IMPLANT CONNECTION ASSEMBLY[1999/47]
French:ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR D'IMPLANT SPINAL[1999/47]
Entry into regional phase10.03.1998National basic fee paid 
10.03.1998Search fee paid 
10.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.03.1998Examination requested  [1999/47]
27.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2004Fee for grant paid
06.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04024174.7  / EP1500375
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI10.11.2004
IT10.11.2004
NL10.11.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
PT10.04.2005
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]FI10.11.2004
NL10.11.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
Former [2006/14]FI10.11.2004
NL10.11.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
Former [2005/46]FI10.11.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
Former [2005/26]FI10.11.2004
GR10.02.2005
Former [2005/24]FI10.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5261909  (SUTTERLIN CHESTER E [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7-9,12 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5047029  (AEBI MAX [CH], et al);
 [X]US5053034  (OLERUD SVEN [SE])