Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0787364

EP0787364 - SELF-LATCHING HANDLE FOR STORAGE BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.12.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLOBE-UNION INC.
5757 North Green Bay Avenue, P.O. Box 591 Milwaukee
WI 53209 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
GLOBE-UNION INC.
5757 North Green Bay Avenue, P.O. Box 591
Milwaukee WI 53209 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Henry, A., Jr.
3262 North 42nd Street
Milwaukee, WI 53216 / US
02 / MAXEL, Walter, S.
12935 Nelson Avenue
Brookfield, WI 53005 / US
03 / NOVAK, David, J.
2437 Swarthout Road
Pinckney, MI 48169 / US
04 / KEPLER, Stephen, J.
22345 Dean Court
South Lyon, MI 48178 / US
05 / KORINEK, Paul, D.
4858 Woodhaven Drive
West Bend, WI 53095 / US
[1997/32]
Representative(s)Steil, Christian , et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert
Otten & Steil
Patentanwälte
Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96929820.730.08.1996
[1997/32]
WO1996US13964
Priority number, dateUS1995052277001.09.1995         Original published format: US 522770
[1997/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9709747
Date:13.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0787364
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997
[1997/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.03.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, B65D25/32
[2000/07]
Former International [1997/32]H01M2/10, A45F5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/32]
TitleGerman:SELBSTVERRIEGELNDER GRIFF FÜR AKKUS[2002/14]
English:SELF-LATCHING HANDLE FOR STORAGE BATTERIES[1997/32]
French:POIGNEE A VERROUILLAGE AUTOMATIQUE POUR DES BATTERIES[2002/14]
Former [1997/32]SELBSTVERRIEGELNDER GRIFF FÜR AKUS
Former [1997/32]POIGNEE A VERROUILLAGE AUTOMATIQUE POUR DES BATTERIE D'ACCUMULATEURS
Entry into regional phase30.04.1997National basic fee paid 
30.04.1997Search fee paid 
30.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
20.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/07]
20.09.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]NL8200147  (CURVER VERPAKKINGEN) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 18 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]GB2095214  (MOTHERCARE LTD) [A] 1-5,7,8,11,12 * page 1, line 82 - line 126 * * figures 1-4B *;
 [A]GB2145994  (SUPERFOS PACKAGING) [A] 1-3,7,8 * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 1 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2244972  (LIN PAC MOULDINGS [GB]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE627030  (ACCUMULATOREN FABRIK AG) [A] 9,10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2047948  (CHLORIDE GROUP LTD) [A] 9,10 * page 1, lines 62-67 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4799306  (COLLINS MALCOLM G [GB], et al) [A] 14 * column 4, line 15 - line 22 * * figures 9,10 *
International search[A]NL8200147  (CURVER VERPAKKINGEN);
 [A]GB2095214  (MOTHERCARE LTD);
 [A]GB2145994  (SUPERFOS PACKAGING);
 [A]GB2244972  (LIN PAC MOULDINGS [GB]);
 [A]US5461755  (HARDIGG JAMES S [US], et al);
 [A]DE627030  (ACCUMULATOREN FABRIK AG);
 [A]GB2047948  (CHLORIDE GROUP LTD);
 [A]US4799306  (COLLINS MALCOLM G [GB], et al)