Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0843650

EP0843650 - BIOFOULING REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baker Hughes Limited
Orion House, 5 Upper St. Martin's Lane
London WC2H 9EH / GB
[2000/20]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
Baker Hughes Limited
5 Upper St. Martin's Lane
London WC2H 9EH / GB
Former [1998/22]For all designated states
Baker Hughes Limited
Hammersley House, 2nd floor, 5-8 Warwick Street
London W1R 6JE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIAMS, Edward Emyr, 10 Ashfurlong Drive
Dore
Sheffield S1 7NP / GB
02 / NICKSON, Peter William, 47 Wendan Road
Newbury
Berkshire RH14 7AJ / GB
03 / KNOX-HOLMES, Brent, Roland
68 Hughfield
Sheffield S6 6BT / GB
04 / WAINWRIGHT, Robert
Hillcrest Church Street Blakesley
Towcester Northants NN12 8RA / GB
[1998/22]
Representative(s)Hano, Christian , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]Hano, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
von Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Patentanwälte, Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date96930320.515.07.1996
[1998/22]
WO1996IB01015
Priority number, dateGB1995001483019.07.1995         Original published format: GB 9514830
[1998/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9703926
Date:06.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0843650
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997
[1998/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0843650
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/50, C02F1/72
[1998/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES [1998/22]
TitleGerman:REDUKTION DES BIOBEWUCHSES[1999/39]
English:BIOFOULING REDUCTION[1998/22]
French:REDUCTION DE L'ENCRASSEMENT BIOLOGIQUE[1998/22]
Former [1998/22]REDUKTION DES BIOBEWUCHES
Entry into regional phase30.01.1998National basic fee paid 
30.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/22]
30.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
29.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2000Fee for grant paid
26.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US4869016  (DIPROSE MICHAEL F [GB], et al) [X] 1-31,35;
 [A]CH141330  (ORNSTEIN GEORG DR [DE]) [A] 1-31,35;
 [A]US5292405  (WICKS GRAHAM [GB]) [A] 1-31,35;
 [A]EP0024875  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-31;
 [A]DE593363  (HRVOJE IVEKOVIC DR ING) [A] 1-31,35;
 [A]US3241512  (GREEN WILLIAM G) [A] 1-31,35;
 [A]US4311598  (VERACHTERT HUBERT) [A] 1-31;
 [A]CH149723  (KRAUSE GEORG ALEXANDER DR [DE]) [A] 1-31,35;
 [X]US4804478  (TAMIR SHLOMO [DE]) [X] 32-33