Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0800678

EP0800678 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ERROR CONTROL IN VIDEO COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.04.2005  [2005/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1997/42]
Inventor(s)01 / LEVINE, Stephen, N.
5N400 Neva Terrace
Itasca, IL 60143 / US
02 / BRAILEAN, James, C.
717 N. Washington Avenue
Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US
03 / BANHAM, Mark, R.
1705 W. Portsmith Lane
Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US
[1997/42]
Representative(s)McCormack, Derek James , et al
Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]McCormack, Derek James , et al
Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [1997/42]Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola Eur. Intel. Prop. Op., Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date96930682.827.08.1996
[1997/42]
WO1996US14144
Priority number, dateUS1995054838526.10.1995         Original published format: US 548385
[1997/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9715888
Date:01.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0800678
Date:15.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997
[1997/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0800678
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/64
[2003/43]
Former International [1997/42]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR FEHLERKONTROLLE BEI DER VIDEOKOMPRESSION[1997/42]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ERROR CONTROL IN VIDEO COMPRESSION[1997/42]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES ERREURS EN COMPRESSION VIDEO[1997/42]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1997National basic fee paid 
28.07.1997Search fee paid 
28.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
25.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2002Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
16.10.2002Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
07.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2004Fee for grant paid
24.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17]
Request for further processing for:15.04.2003Request for further processing filed
15.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.08.2003Decision despatched
19.09.2002Request for further processing filed
19.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request procedure closed
16.10.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5148271  (KATO SHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * * figures 2A,2B,10 * * column 2, line 21 - line 46 * * column 5, line 47 - line 57 * [A] 9;
 [Y]EP0554871  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5392037  (KATO SHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 6A,6B,7 * * column 24, line 60 - column 25, line 8 *;
 [A]EP0501755  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 29, line 6 - line 31 * * column 30, line 38 - column 31, line 4 * * figures 26,28 *;
 [A]  - WAI-MAN LAM ET AL, "AN ERROR CONCEALMENT ALGORITHM FOR IMAGES SUBJECT TO CHANNEL ERRORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (19950501), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 533 - 542, XP000504549 [A] 3,7,10 * Section II - Section III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.382489
International search[X]US5436664  (HENRY MICHEL [FR]);
 [XP]US5485213  (MURASHITA KIMITAKA [JP], et al);
 [A]US5155592  (VERBIEST WILLEM J A [BE], et al);
 [A]US5457495  (HARTUNG JOHN [US])