blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0850541

EP0850541 - UPGRADABLE ON-SCREEN DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10333 North Meridian Street
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLATTER, Harold
2220 Brewster Road
Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US
02 / KVINTUS, Michael, Francis, Jr.
4234 South Willow Brook
Terre Haute, IN 47802 / US
03 / McLANE, Michael, Joseph
720 Sherwood Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46240 / US
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte
Technicolor
European Patent Operations
1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte
Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
Former [1998/27]Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte
THOMSON multimedia, Licensing and IP, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne cedex / FR
Application number, filing date96930873.313.09.1996
[1998/27]
WO1996US14733
Priority number, dateUS1995003834315.09.1995         Original published format: US 38343
GB1996000333214.02.1996         Original published format: GB 9603332
[1998/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9710682
Date:20.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0850541
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0850541
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:H04N9/87
[1998/27]
CPC:
H04N5/445 (EP,KR,US); H04N21/426 (EP,US); H04N21/434 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US); H04N5/765 (EP,US); H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/9305 (EP,US); H04N9/641 (EP,US); H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8715 (EP,US); H04N5/46 (EP,US); H04N5/926 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US); H04N9/888 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/27]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES ON-SCREEN-ANZEIGESYSTEM[1998/27]
English:UPGRADABLE ON-SCREEN DISPLAY[1998/27]
French:AFFICHAGE A L'ECRAN AVEC POSSIBILITE D'EXTENSION[1998/27]
Entry into regional phase11.03.1998National basic fee paid 
11.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
14.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.08.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.1998Fee for grant paid
31.10.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999  13.01.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstrasse 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/03]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
19.01.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.07.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.08.2000Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2000Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.02.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
25.05.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/37]
Appeal following opposition30.03.2001Appeal received No.  T0396/01
14.06.2001Statement of grounds filed
25.05.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
25.05.2004Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0220007  (NIPPON MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS MFG [JP]) [A] 1,4,9 * page 2, line 1 - line 48; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5097348  (SUETAKA HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,4,9* column W *;
 [A]EP0529834  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,9 * column 9, line 20 - column 11, line 39; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.