Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0854848

EP0854848 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DIFLUOROMETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 15.12.2010  [2010/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLEMMER, Paul, Gene
128 Royal Parkway West
Williamsville, NY 14221 / US
02 / SMITH, Addison, Miles
80 Berryman Drive
Amherst, NY 14226 / US
03 / TUNG, Hsueh, Sung
16 Vassar Drive
Getzville, NY 14068 / US
04 / BASS, John, Stephen
327 Greengage Circle
East Amherst, NY 14051 / US
[1998/31]
Representative(s)Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2009/52]Clarke, Lionel Paul , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1998/31]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date96930874.113.09.1996
[1998/31]
WO1996US14734
Priority number, dateUS1995053064920.09.1995         Original published format: US 530649
[1998/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9711043
Date:27.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0854848
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997
[1998/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0854848
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C19/08, C07C17/20
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIFLUOROMETHAN[1998/31]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DIFLUOROMETHANE[1998/31]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DIFLUOROMETHANE[1998/31]
Entry into regional phase23.02.1998National basic fee paid 
23.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/31]
16.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2002Fee for grant paid
02.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.12.2003  29.12.2003  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
4-8, Cours Michelet
92091 Paris La Défense / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2008/45]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2003  29.12.2003  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
4-8, Cours Michelet
92091 Paris La Défense / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2007/02]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2003  29.12.2003  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
4-8, Cours Michelet
92091 Paris La Défense / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
Former [2004/06]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2003   
Atofina
4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.01.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.08.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.04.2006Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.05.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
15.06.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/50]
15.06.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.07.2006Appeal received No.  T1114/06
19.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
15.06.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
15.06.2010Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:09.02.2001Request for further processing filed
13.02.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.06.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.03.2003
BE19.03.2003
CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
DK19.06.2003
SE19.06.2003
IE15.09.2003
PT13.03.2006
[2006/25]
Former [2004/40]AT19.03.2003
BE19.03.2003
CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
DK19.06.2003
SE19.06.2003
IE15.09.2003
Former [2004/23]AT19.03.2003
BE19.03.2003
CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
DK19.06.2003
SE19.06.2003
Former [2004/10]AT19.03.2003
BE19.03.2003
CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
SE19.06.2003
Former [2003/50]AT19.03.2003
CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
SE19.06.2003
Former [2003/47]AT19.03.2003
CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
Former [2003/46]CH19.03.2003
GR19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
Former [2003/40]CH19.03.2003
LI19.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9421579  (ICI PLC) [Y] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0128510  (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 1-10 * page 9, lines 5-7; claim - *;
 [Y]JPH06263657  ;
 [Y]US5208395  (ELSHEIKH MAHER Y) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 13 - line 28; claim - *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941216), vol. 018, no. 668, Database accession no. (C - 1289), & JP06263657 A 19940920 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *