blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0853540


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2008  [2008/24]
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
20.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.10.1999 Renewal fee
22.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
22.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.07.1999 First examination report
08.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
28.09.1998 Renewal fee
27.07.1998 Amendment by applicant
05.06.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.07.1998 [1998/30]
05.06.1998 Request for examination filed published on  22.07.1998 [1998/30]
25.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.1996 PCT data prior to European publication