Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0853540
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3869012BGlobal Dossier 17.01.2007B2
JPH11513329 16.11.1999A
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0853540Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0853540 22.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT192065T 15.05.2000T
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9610729 13.07.1999A
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59605067D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0853540T 21.08.2000T3
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GR3033975T 30.11.2000T3
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR19990063686 26.07.1999A
Priority number Date
CH9600344 02.10.1996
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6824382 30.11.2004B2
US2002119214 29.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US4393100 21.04.2000
CH277895 03.10.1995
US8437502 28.02.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9712742Global Dossier 10.04.1997A1
Priority number Date
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1082877C 17.04.2002C
CN1198703 11.11.1998A
Priority number Date
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2147932T 01.10.2000T3
Priority number Date
CH277895 03.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT853540E 31.10.2000E
Priority number Date
CH277895 03.10.1995