Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853540

EP0853540 - CLOSING UNIT FOR AN INJECTION MOULDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ettlinger Kunststoffmaschinen GmbH
Messerschmittring 49
86343 Königsbrunn / DE
[1998/30]
Inventor(s)01 / GANZ, Martin
Burriweg 106
CH-8050 Zürich / CH
02 / SILLMANN, Paul
Laengmattstrasse 13
CH-4563 Gerlafingen / CH
[1998/30]
Representative(s)Ritscher, Thomas
Ritscher & Partner AG
Resirain 1
8125 Zollikerberg / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]Ritscher, Thomas, Dr.
RITSCHER & SEIFERT Patentanwälte VSP Kreuzstrasse 82
8032 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date96930949.102.10.1996
[1998/30]
WO1996CH00344
Priority number, dateCH1995000277803.10.1995         Original published format: CH 277895
[1998/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9712742
Date:10.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0853540
Date:22.07.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1998/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853540
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/17, B29C45/67
[1998/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/30]
TitleGerman:SCHLIESSEINHEIT FÜR EINE SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE[1998/30]
English:CLOSING UNIT FOR AN INJECTION MOULDING MACHINE[1998/30]
French:UNITE DE FERMETURE POUR UNE PRESSE D'INJECTION[1998/30]
Entry into regional phase07.03.1998National basic fee paid 
07.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.03.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/30]
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2000Fee for grant paid
07.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR26.04.2000
[2008/24]
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2012206  (ENRIETTI L, et al) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4426521  (BATTENFELD FISCHER BLASFORM [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 3; claims 3,4 *;
 [A]US5143736  (KUMAMURA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 8; figures 2A,2B * * column 13, line 1 - line 38; figure 6 *;
 [DA]DE9212480U  (ENGEL MASCHINENBAU) [DA] 1,5,6 * the whole document *