Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0789686

EP0789686 - RETINOYLAMIDE BASED DERIVATIVES OF SPHINGOID BASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Former [1997/34]For all designated states
GIST-BROCADES B.V.
Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LAMBERS, Johannes, Wilhelmus, Jacobus
Altena 10
NL-2641 LB Pijnacker / NL
02 / VERWEIJ, Jan
P.J. Blokstraat 13
NL-2313 ES Leiden / NL
[1997/34]
Representative(s)Visser-Luirink, Gesina , et al
DSM Patents & Trademarks
Office Delft
P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Visser-Luirink, Gesina , et al
DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Delft P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [1997/34]Visser-Luirink, Gesina, Dr. , et al
Gist-Brocades B.V., Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Application number, filing date96931002.802.09.1996
[1997/34]
WO1996EP03848
Priority number, dateEP1995020236901.09.1995         Original published format: EP 95202369
[1997/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9709307
Date:13.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0789686
Date:20.08.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997
[1997/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0789686
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C403/18, A61K31/07, A61K31/20, A61K7/48
[1997/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1997/34]
TitleGerman:DERIVATE VON SPHINGOID BASEN AUF BASIS VON RETINOYLAMID[1997/34]
English:RETINOYLAMIDE BASED DERIVATIVES OF SPHINGOID BASES[1997/34]
French:DERIVES DE BASES SPHINGOIDES CONTENANT DU RETINOYLAMIDE[1997/34]
Entry into regional phase02.06.1997National basic fee paid 
02.06.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
22.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1999Fee for grant paid
08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5190876  (MERRILL JR ALFRED H [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0009776  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * claim - *;
 [Y]FR2081477  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [Y] 1-8 * claim - *