Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0851980

EP0851980 - ROTARY VANE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH SISTEMI FRENANTI S.p.A.
Via Cavalli 53/A, Casa postale 66
26013 Crema / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/28]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH SISTEMI FRENANTI S.p.A.
Via Cavalli 53/A, Casa postale 66
26013 Crema / IT
Inventor(s)01 / TORAZZI, Alberto
Via Le Republica, 18
I-26013 Crema / IT
02 / BONOMI, Alberto
Via Stefano Pavesi, 9
I-26013 Crema / IT
[1998/28]
Representative(s)Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE
126 rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE, 126 rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1999/22]Bee, Joachim , et al
Robert Bosch GmbH Zentalabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/28]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE, 126 rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date96931052.309.09.1996
[1998/28]
WO1996EP03942
Priority number, dateIT1995TO0073718.09.1995         Original published format: IT TO950737
[1998/28]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9711277
Date:27.03.1997
Language:FR
[1997/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0851980
Date:08.07.1998
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997
[1998/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0851980
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:F04C18/344, F04C29/02
[1998/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/28]
TitleGerman:FLÜGELZELLEN PUMPE[1998/28]
English:ROTARY VANE PUMP[1998/28]
French:POMPE ROTATIVE A PALETTES[1998/28]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1997National basic fee paid 
02.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.1997Examination requested  [1998/28]
10.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.1999Fee for grant paid
08.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DY]GB480522  (BENDIX AVIAT CORP) [DY] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [DY]JPS62170701  ;
 [A]US3187679  (FRANK SCOGNAMILLO) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4493626  (NOZAKI TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1376713  (SERIEYS) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2026739  (JOHNSON JAMES P) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS57159990
 [DY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880113), vol. 12, no. 10, Database accession no. (M - 658)<2857> , [DY] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821225), vol. 6, no. 267, Database accession no. (M - 182)<1145> , [A] 1 * abstract *