04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
14.03.2003 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
07.03.2003 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
01.06.2001 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
20.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
02.02.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
10.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
26.05.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
12.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
28.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
20.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |
11.06.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
23.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.10.1998 |
First examination report |
|
14.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.1998 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.08.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
07.08.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
22.07.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|