Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0852797

EP0852797 - PACKAGING COMPRISING A MESSAGE TRANSMISSION MEANS, AND BOARD FOR SUPPORTING SAID MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ciechanowski, Stanislas
Venelle de l'Octroi 7 à B
1300 Wavre / BE
[1998/29]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Breese, Pierre
Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96931691.820.09.1996
[1998/29]
WO1996BE00098
Priority number, dateBE1995000079326.09.1995         Original published format: BE 9500793
[1998/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9712365
Date:03.04.1997
Language:FR
[1997/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0852797
Date:15.07.1998
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997
[1998/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0852797
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search reportEP03.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G11B33/04
[1998/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/29]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG MIT MITTEL ZUR VERBREITUNG EINER MITTEILUNG UND HALTEPLATTE FÜR DAS MITTEL[1998/29]
English:PACKAGING COMPRISING A MESSAGE TRANSMISSION MEANS, AND BOARD FOR SUPPORTING SAID MEANS[1998/29]
French:EMBALLAGE COMPORTANT UN MOYEN DE DIFFUSION D'UN MESSAGE ET PLAQUETTE POUR SUPPORTER CE MOYEN[1998/29]
Entry into regional phase19.03.1998National basic fee paid 
19.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/29]
20.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
IT12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
LU20.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2007/29]AT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
LU20.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2004/07]AT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/46]AT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/09]AT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/42]AT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/27]AT12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
Former [2002/23]AT12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
Former [2002/11]AT12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DE13.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2001/29]AT12.01.2000
FI12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
IE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/17]AT12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
IE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT12.01.2000
GB12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5081446  (GILL PETER L [US], et al) [Y] 1,10 * column 4, line 22 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-6 * [A] 1,5;
 [A]EP0509284  (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1 * column W *
 [Y]  - "Einchip FM Emphänger für UKW-kleinstradio's", FUNK-TECHNIK, (1983), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 281 - 283, XP000600117 [Y] 1,10 * page 281, column L *
 [A]  - W. ZETZMANN, "FM-Emphänger mit 16 Beinen", FUNKSCHAU, GERMANY, (1983), vol. 14, pages 35 - 36, XP002011709 [A] 1,5